Trustees MARINE STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL

Charity number: 1066806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr WERNER KIENE Chair 12 August 2013
None on record
Kristjan Davidsson Th. Trustee 27 July 2021
None on record
Dr Kevin Terrance Stokes Trustee 29 July 2020
None on record
Maria Damanaki Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Giles Bolton Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
David Lock Trustee 20 November 2018
None on record
Paul Stewart Uys Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record