Financial history THE CARDIFF HIGH SCHOOL PARTNERSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1063086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £25.57k £15.14k £17.96k £14.18k £23.42k
Total expenditure £23.78k £11.31k £1.37k £4.11k £15.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A