DISASTERS EMERGENCY COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1062638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £54.05m £29.02m £45.48m £9.89m £33.10m
Total expenditure £50.60m £28.81m £27.82m £29.55m £24.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £48.00k £60.00k £332.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.33m £1.05m £1.32m £1.06m £2.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £52.43m £27.79m £44.02m £8.72m £30.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £295.00k £173.00k £140.00k £109.00k £15.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £17.92k £128.00k £30.00k £0 £1.10m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £46.31m £24.91m £22.74m £27.10m £20.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.29m £3.90m £5.09m £2.45m £4.03m
Expenditure - Governance £202.00k £200.00k £227.00k £208.00k £93.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £22.25m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £32.96k £0 £0 £26.55k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0