NEW DIRECTIONS (BLACKPOOL) COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1063394
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3019 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3019 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3385 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3385 days
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 October 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 29 October 2010 On time
Annual return 31 March 2009 12 January 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 January 2010 On time
Annual return 31 March 2008 28 May 2009 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 May 2009 101 days late