NEW DIRECTIONS (BLACKPOOL) COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1063394
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £145.66k £148.12k £156.22k £153.25k £129.01k
Total expenditure £135.06k £142.84k £155.05k £144.14k £147.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A