Accounts and annual returns THE OAKES TRUST (SHEFFIELD)

Charity number: 1064155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window