Accounts and annual returns BEAVERS ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1068736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 February 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window