THE TYNEHOLME TRUST

Charity number: 1064439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £21.87k £27.88k £27.52k £27.75k £26.35k
Total expenditure £15.85k £17.76k £19.02k £19.95k £25.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A