THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062764
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)