Royal Academy Trust

Charity number: 1067270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £680.75k £879.93k £8.19m £2.98m £1.26m
Total expenditure £14.01m £1.11m £5.09m £2.20m £2.59m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.40m £275.32k £16.00m £2.40m £642.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £3.97m £43.10k £8.26m £1.07m £0
Income - Investment £247.93k £604.61k £446.44k £586.73k £618.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.44m
Income - Legacies £283.90k £7.27k £167.64k £1.07m £500.03k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.86m £841.45k £4.84m £1.94m £2.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £148.59k £267.57k £247.59k £258.77k £209.05k
Expenditure - Governance £14.72k £17.82k £15.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £1.94m £2.38m
Expenditure - Investment management £86.27k £119.25k £167.06k £186.93k £73.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0