Financial history ROYAL SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF DERBY

Charity number: 1062507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.16m £3.86m £4.36m £4.51m £4.96m
Total expenditure £3.87m £3.81m £4.17m £4.08m £4.48m
Income from government contracts £3.60m N/A £3.95m £4.22m £3.17m
Income from government grants £115.60k N/A £82.83k £268.88k £1.70m
Income - Donations and legacies £552.86k £415.92k £405.00k £274.68k £16.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.60m £3.44m £3.95m £4.22m £4.94m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £4.66k £5.89k £9.32k £7.46k £5.28k
Income - Legacies £45.71k £0 £0 £0 £1.27k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.87m £3.81m £4.17m £4.08m £4.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £49.07k £76.05k £60.51k £56.18k £51.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0