THE ORTHODOX PARISH OF SAINT AIDAN AND SAINT CHAD NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a place of Orthodox Christian worship for all. Provide spiritual and emotional care and support for those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD PATRICK FITZPATRICK WILLIAMS | Chair | 29 June 2003 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pearce | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexey Bolsinov | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Fleetwood | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
INNA MOROZOVA | Trustee | 27 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Wood | Trustee | 29 June 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.39k | £22.64k | £23.80k | £30.55k | £40.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.07k | £14.41k | £12.56k | £19.54k | £22.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ORTHODOX FAITH WORSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE WITHIN THE PARISH WHICH IS IN AN AREA WITHIN A 60 MILE RADIUS OF THEREABOUTS OF NOTTINGHAM
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Cromwell Street
Carlton
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 1EN
- Phone:
- 0115 9611662
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window