THE GREATER NOAKHALI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1065467
Charity reporting is overdue by 1734 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 273 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 273 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 638 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 638 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1004 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1004 days
Annual return 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1369 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1369 days
Annual return 30 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1734 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1734 days