WOODGATE ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of safe and stimulating play activities for children 6 to 14 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £111,547 from 3 government contract(s) and £116,575 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tami Marie Gunby Betts | Chair | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Towers | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ventola | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|||||
MAXINE STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.28k | £370.89k | £257.71k | £272.18k | £298.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.46k | £356.71k | £276.55k | £294.25k | £313.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £116.65k | £103.19k | £111.55k | |
|
Income from government grants | £267.30k | £177.46k | £1.00k | £116.58k | £116.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND APRIL 1998 as amended on 15 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES WITHOUT THE DISTINCTION OF RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN, NATIONAL ORIGIN, NATIONALITY, COLOUR, SEX, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS FOR THE EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE WEST OF LEICESTER (SPECIFICALLY THE WOODGATE, TUDOR ROAD AND NEWFOUNDPOOL AREAS) FOR WHICH THEY HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
WEST OF LEICESTER SPECIFICALLY THE WOODGATE TUDOR ROAD AND NEWFOUNDPOOL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODGATE ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND
C/O WOODGATE RESOURCES CENTRE
36 WOODGATE
LEICESTER
LE3 5GE
- Phone:
- 01162624258
- Email:
- therally@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window