INTERCOUNTRY ADOPTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1067313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.67m £2.03m £2.17m £1.94m £2.72m
Total expenditure £1.63m £1.97m £2.16m £2.17m £2.03m
Income from government contracts £286.98k £383.94k £509.06k £520.73k £522.80k
Income from government grants £141.71k £293.63k N/A N/A £606.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.73k £10.50k £11.48k £14.95k £37.03k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £31.38k £2.05k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.70m £2.16m £1.93m £2.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £37.03k
Income - Investment £161 £55 £38 £68 £141
Income - Other £141.71k £293.63k £0 £0 £596.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.94m £2.16m £2.17m £2.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.77k £25.05k £2.36k £3.68k £8.52k
Expenditure - Governance £7.66k £12.96k £9.12k £8.68k £7.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0