LANCASHIRE OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1069324
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £166.52k £521.06k £654.07k £556.17k £748.30k
Total expenditure £14.19k £456.32k £618.71k £527.54k £744.00k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £92.36k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £5.00k £20.00k £178.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £569.46k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £521.01k £649.02k £536.07k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £50 £51 £99 £472
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £313.59k £132.38k £103.64k £146.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £5.64k £367 £2.38k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £142.74k £480.69k £423.54k £595.01k