Trustees THE CARERS CENTRE (BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE)
Charity number: 1063226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Winifred Whittington | Chair | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Hunt | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Raymond | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jen Cheshire | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jen Tomkinson | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jones | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Janis Manley Winn | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.