LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To advance the Christian faith through the world until the coming of the Lord Jesus Christ. b) To Advance Christian education by the provision of training, organised courses, seminars etc. c) To promote the spirit of unity as prayed for by Jesus Christ. d) To releave poverty and distress by providing welfare services to the needy members of the community and the public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 10 November 1997: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS ANNAM ANNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX BUADI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 243 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 243 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 609 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 609 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 January 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED ON 6 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
[A] TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE WORLD UNTIL THE COMING OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST. [B] . TO ADVANCE OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING ORGANISED COURSES, SEMINARS ETC. [C] TO PROMOTE THE SPIRIT OF UNITY AS PRAYED FOR BY JESUS CHRIST. [D] TO RELIEF POVERTY AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING WELFARE SERVICES TO THE NEEDY MEMBERS AD TE PUBLIC AT LARGE. [E] , TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN PLACE[S] OF WORSHIP AND CARRY ON RELIGIOUS SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WICKHAM CRESCENT
WEST WICKHAM
BR4 0RT
- Phone:
- 07894712340
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window