FRIENDS OF SOUTH MILFORD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in raising funds for a primary school for the sole benefit of helping the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 March 1998: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 March 2011: Re-registered
- F.O.S.M.S (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Louise Hill | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Hughes | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam James Gannon | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Allan | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Gannon | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Ruth Burrows | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Lawrence | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82k | £14.52k | £13.43k | £12.92k | £8.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £7.45k | £16.49k | £11.57k | £5.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH MILFORD PRIMARY SCHOOL
SAND LANE
SOUTH MILFORD
LEEDS
LS25 5AU
- Phone:
- 01977 682359
- Email:
- southmilfordpta@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window