Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAELS PRE SCHOOL ALDERSHOT
Charity number: 1063241
Charity reporting is overdue by 1755 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 294 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 294 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 659 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 659 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1024 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1024 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1389 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1389 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1755 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1755 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window