SAINT LAWRENCE CHURCH TRUST: WEST WYCOMBE

Charity number: 1063601
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 901 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 901 days
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 November 2018 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required