SAINT LAWRENCE CHURCH TRUST: WEST WYCOMBE

Charity number: 1063601
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £6.60k £13.44k £2.46k £3.10k £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £100 £100 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0