Trustees OXFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1064776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor William Hadden Whyte Chair 04 March 2019
SAINT JOHN BAPTIST COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
OXFORD HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS CHURCH WOLVERCOTE
Received: On time
Dr Laura Flannigan Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Gemmill Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Amanda Ponsonby Trustee 27 March 2023
CHURCHILL OLD CHURCH PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE WALTER AND LANGSTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCHILL AND SARSDEN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
Michael Heaton Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Christopher John Gorrill Parker Trustee 29 June 2020
None on record
HILARY ROSE HIBBERT-BILES Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
Dr Donald John Ratcliffe Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
SARAH JANE TAYLOR Trustee 15 March 2011
SYLVA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THAME HOSPITAL
Received: 7 days late
THE RYCOTE BUILDINGS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Catherine Fulljames Trustee 16 March 2009
THE COUNTESS OF JERSEY'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Jill Pellew Trustee 14 March 2005
Wild Arts
Received: On time
PROFESSOR ROBERT EVANS Trustee 17 March 2003
FRIENDS OF SUNNINGWELL SCHOOL
Received: On time
FARMERS WORLD NETWORK
Overdue by 207 days
BRIGADIER JOHN NIGEL MOGG DL Trustee 13 March 2000
None on record
JOHN HARWOOD DL Trustee 17 March 1997
None on record
TOM GRAFTON HASSALL OBE Trustee 17 March 1997
None on record