OCTAVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 May 2000: Standard registration
- 06 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.33k | £101 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.19k | £242 | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 31 July 2007 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 05 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 27 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 10 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS IN ANY FORM AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE CONDITIONS WHICH PREVENT THOSE WHO PERFORM IN THE ARTS FROM DOING SO AND TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF PERFORMING ARTS (THE "OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window