THE SHALOM YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1072217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.31k £30.04k £90.15k £75.37k £102.35k
Total expenditure £53.32k £58.14k £75.30k £88.58k £93.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £19.00k N/A N/A