Accounts and annual returns LGBT FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1070904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window