Financial history LGBT FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1070904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.10m £2.18m £2.11m £2.70m £3.07m
Total expenditure £1.96m £2.17m £2.11m £2.69m £2.72m
Income from government contracts £643.58k £441.59k £265.75k £409.36k £388.22k
Income from government grants £250.20k £400.21k N/A £861.29k £889.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £84.50k £114.91k £269.46k £370.86k £372.82k
Income - Other trading activities £67.42k £44.09k £0 £68.57k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.92m £2.01m £1.75m £2.25m £2.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £20.36k £17.25k £92.44k £8.41k £198.97k
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £56.00k £0 £13.85k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.91m £2.12m £2.06m £2.64m £2.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.79k £47.38k £51.07k £49.62k £49.76k
Expenditure - Governance £38.50k £32.02k £32.02k £34.97k £38.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0