Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HAWKES FARM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1069600
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required