FACES IN FOCUS

Charity number: 1063967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time Download