Financial history FACES IN FOCUS

Charity number: 1063967
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £37.57k £28.20k £133.90k £23.15k £22.12k
Total expenditure £29.42k £27.27k £53.04k £74.05k £37.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A