Accounts and annual returns THE GEOFF HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1067258
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 12 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 25 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window