Financial history HIGH WYCOMBE AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1065069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.66k £9.43k £9.94k £9.15k £6.23k
Total expenditure £8.70k £6.73k £11.70k £10.47k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A