EDEN VALLEY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1065466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late Download