EDEN VALLEY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1065466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £28.32k £35.92k £37.04k £26.19k £44.38k
Total expenditure £34.50k £41.76k £28.19k £30.72k £39.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £6.00k N/A £21.05k