TYNEMOUTH PRIORY THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the season we produced four plays and a pantomime. Monthly meetings held for our members consisted of one-act plays and music. Throughout the year various social and fund-raising activities were arranged including weekly coffee mornings. The theatre was hired out on various occasions throughout the year. Funds received are used to maintain and improve our property.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 24 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Lockey | Chair | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COOPER | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Bowman | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hope | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Hill | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Fiona Elspeth Jones | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Glen Kingston | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hardy | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Broughton | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW HALL | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Leake | Trustee | 10 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.63k | £26.26k | £27.81k | £56.91k | £50.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.02k | £26.09k | £22.65k | £35.35k | £40.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tynemouth Priory Theatre
Percy Street
NORTH SHIELDS
NE30 4HA
- Phone:
- 0191 2575186
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window