FRIENDS OF SANDON AND AMBERGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising through annual summer and christmas fairs, raffles etc. All activities undertaken at Grantham Additional Needs Fellowship which comprises Sandon and Ambergate Schools, Grantham in Lincolnshire, UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 21 November 1997: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SANDON (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Bennington | Chair | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Whittaker | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Freestone | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Pears | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Capindale | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bembridge | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Shakesby | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wainscott | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Scarlett | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Vidler | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Chantry-Parke | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE CAPINDALE | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ellis | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dale Copson | Trustee | 01 January 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.73k | £21.82k | £14.79k | £17.14k | £14.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.20k | £4.10k | £35.47k | £12.14k | £17.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 The Belfry
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG319QL
- Phone:
- 07932065143
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window