ST AGATHA'S PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 July 1997: Standard registration
- ST AGATHAS PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Myburgh | Chair | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Agata Murray | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ryder | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.19k | £14.13k | £39.16k | £39.86k | £49.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.45k | £11.39k | £39.89k | £37.98k | £48.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.?
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. AGATHAS RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
ST. AGATHAS DRIVE
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 5TY
- Phone:
- 07759936925
- Email:
- stagathaspsa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window