Accounts and annual returns GOLCAR C E HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2021 24 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 08 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required