Financial history GOLCAR C E HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021
Total gross income £2.07k £3.87k £3.98k £3.89k £967
Total expenditure £1.95k £3.90k £4.10k £1.62k £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A