BROMLEY HEATH SCOUT AND GUIDE HEADQUARTERS

Charity number: 1066766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.20k £867 £960 £1.18k £0
Total expenditure £9.16k £1.45k £1.20k £941 £578
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A