Trustees CARDIFF THIRD SECTOR COUNCIL (C3SC)
Charity number: 1068623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Mesa | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Duncan-Jones | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Radha Nair-Roberts | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Llinos Moulogo | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John Kiiza | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NEIL ANTHONY BINNELL | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul John W Keeping | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Thomas | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE PRICE | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.