Financial history THE ANGEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.85m £6.51m £3.83m £3.38m £3.44m
Total expenditure £7.42m £5.73m £3.10m £5.22m £2.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.98m £5.70m £3.38m £3.08m £3.05m
Income - Other trading activities £2.85k £7.86k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £749.15k £798.80k £449.80k £289.30k £347.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.99k £854 £920 £12.92k £34.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £35 £10.48k
Income - Legacies £68.28k £144.88k £3.29k £500 £23.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.95m £5.36m £3.10m £3.12m £2.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £122.45k £59.72k £102.37k £278.39k £26.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £77.49k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £470.20k £376.10k £0 £2.10m £0