Accounts and annual returns CAMPAIGN FOR LEARNING

Charity number: 1064113
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Annual return 31 July 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 27 April 2017 On time