RHEMA CHURCH LONDON

Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RHEMA CHURCH LONDON IS A THRIVING, CONTEMPORARY EVANGELICAL CHURCH BASED IN THE HEART OF CROYDON. FOCUSSED ON BUILDING UP AND SUPPORTING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, BACKGROUNDS AND WALKS OF LIFE, WITH PRACTICAL BIBLE BASED TEACHING SO THEY MAY BE EQUIPPED AND DEVELOP A GREATER KNOWLEDGE OF GOD, JESUS AND THE HOLY SPIRIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- LOGOS BIBLE CHURCH (Previous name)
- LOGOS REVIVAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £846.53k | £636.08k | £18.95k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £733.46k | £776.68k | £344.92k | £163.43k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £846.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £846.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £700.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £288 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £32.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £32.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST SEALED ON 14TH JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 2001 AND 7 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING GENERALITY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF THE AGED, INFIRM AND POOR PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window