ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THOMAS TROTTER FOR ST. PAUL'S BRAINTREE

Charity number: 1068005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £818 £757 £668 £835 £750
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A