THE ASTON MARTIN HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1072410
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £209.79k £165.91k £208.86k £218.36k £265.73k
Total expenditure £167.47k £145.90k £227.28k £227.38k £223.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A