Financial history THE ROMEERA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1076325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.63k £138 £3.03k £498 £100
Total expenditure £1.07m £297.60k £192.40k £10.57k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A