Accounts and annual returns WORLDWIDE DRAGONFLY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1066039
Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2021 525 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days