WORLDWIDE DRAGONFLY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1066039
Charity reporting is overdue by 1126 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.72k £8.21k £59.90k £9.31k £24.63k
Total expenditure £1.88k £12.21k £49.72k £5.93k £23.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A