AL-ZAHRA WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1074719
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 15 October 2019 29 March 2021 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2018 19 February 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2016 09 October 2017 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2016 Not Required